IN SB0273 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Public Law 37
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on March 11 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Public Law 37
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Biomarker testing coverage. Requires a health plan (which includes a policy of accident and sickness insurance, a health maintenance organization contract, the Medicaid risk based managed care program, and a state employee health plan) to provide coverage for biomarker testing for the purposes of diagnosis, treatment, appropriate management, or ongoing monitoring of an enrollee's disease or condition when biomarker testing is supported by medical and scientific evidence. Requires the office of Medicaid policy and planning to provide biomarker testing as a Medicaid program service, and to apply to the United States Department of Health and Human Services for approval of any waiver necessary under the federal Medicaid program for the purpose of providing biomarker testing. Provides that coverage is not required for biomarker testing for screening purposes. Provides that if a prior authorization requirement applies to biomarker testing, the health plan or a third party acting on behalf of the health plan must: (1) approve or deny a request for prior authorization; and (2) notify the covered individual of the approval or denial; in not more than five business days in the case of a nonurgent request or in not more than 48 hours in the case of an urgent request. Requires the office of the secretary of family and social services to report certain information to the budget committee on Medicaid reimbursement rates provided for biomarker testing.
Title
Biomarker testing coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | Public Law 37 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2024-02-28 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2024-02-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 236: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2024-02-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-02-22 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-02-15 | House | Representative Lehman added as cosponsor |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2024-02-15 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-02-15 | House | Representative Porter added as cosponsor |
2024-02-13 | House | Representative Clere added as cosponsor |
2024-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2024-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Barrett |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 142: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as coauthor |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senator Glick added as coauthor |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senator Bassler added as coauthor |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Senator Leising added as third author |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Senator Qaddoura added as coauthor |
2024-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senators Charbonneau and Becker |