IN SB0265 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Public Law 103
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Public Law 103
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
TANF eligibility. Sets the income eligibility requirements for the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) program at a specified percentage of the federal income poverty level. Requires the division of family resources (division) to amend the state TANF plan or take any other action necessary to implement the income requirements. Increases certain payment amounts nder the TANF program. Repeals provisions: (1) regarding TANF eligibility of a child born more than 10 months after the child's family qualifies for TANF assistance; (2) encouraging a family that receives TANF assistance to receive family planning counseling; and (3) requiring the division to apply a percentage reduction to the total needs of TANF applicants and recipients in computing TANF benefits. Provides that TANF assistance shall be provided to a woman who: (1) is pregnant at the time an application for assistance is filed; and (2) meets the income requirements. Requires the office of the secretary of family and social services to calculate and report to the legislative council, by December 1 of every even-numbered year, the amounts that would result if certain payment amounts were adjusted each year using the Social Security cost of living adjustment rate. Makes conforming changes.
Title
TANF eligibility.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] |
Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. Eric Bassler [R] | Sen. Stacey Donato [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] |
Rep. Tonya Pfaff [D] | Rep. Cherrish Pryor [D] | Rep. Chuck Goodrich [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Public Law 103 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 351: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2023-04-04 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 352: yeas 93, nays 4 |
2023-04-04 | House | Representative Goodrich added as cosponsor |
2023-04-03 | House | Representative Pryor added as cosponsor |
2023-04-03 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-03-30 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senator Donato added as coauthor |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senator Bassler added as coauthor |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Pfaff |
2023-01-30 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Clere |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 37: yeas 45, nays 0 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senators Ford J.D. and Breaux added as coauthors |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senator Becker added as coauthor |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senator Walker G added as second author |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ford Jon |
Subjects
CHILDREN AND MINORS, Child Care Programs
HUMAN SERVICES
WELFARE, Aid to Families with Dependent Children
WELFARE, Poor Relief
HUMAN SERVICES
WELFARE, Aid to Families with Dependent Children
WELFARE, Poor Relief