IN SB0259 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
STEM education. Establishes an early learning STEM (science, technology, engineering, and mathematics) associate degree model program. Provides for the selection of 10 high schools from around Indiana to participate.
Title
STEM education. Establishes an early learning STEM (science, technology, engineering, and mathematics) associate degree model program. Provides for the selection of 10 high schools from around Indiana to participate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education & Career Development - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education & Career Development - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Representatives Stemler and Goodin added as cosponsor |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Representative Clere added as sponsor |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 78: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senators Raatz and Rogers added as coauthor |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senators Bassler, Schneider, Ford added as coauthors |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as second author |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Senator Steele removed as second author |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as third author |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senator Steele added as second author |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Senator Breaux removed as coauthor |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2015-01-07 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Education & Career Development |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Grooms |