IN SB0216 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 112
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 112
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Educational costs exemptions. Amends the eligibility requirements for educational costs exemptions for children of and certain individuals related to certain veterans. Provides that a spouse or dependent of a qualified veteran is eligible to pay the resident tuition rate of a state educational institution if certain requirements are met. Removes the following: (1) Provisions concerning cumulative grade point average requirements for individuals who qualify for an exemption because of a father or mother (or other relation for certain individuals) who enlisted or otherwise initially served in the armed forces of the United States after June 30, 2011. (2) A provision requiring the commission for higher education to consider other higher education financial assistance in determining the amount of an exemption. (Another provision in current law requires any other financial assistance specifically designated for educational costs to be subtracted from the amount an applicant is exempt from paying.) Repeals and relocates, with changes to the eligibility requirements, the following categories of individuals exempted from educational costs at state educational institutions: (1) Children or surviving spouses of public safety officers. (2) Children or spouses of members of the 1977 police officers' and firefighters' pension and disability fund who sustain a catastrophic physical personal injury in the line of duty. (3) Children and spouses of Indiana National Guard members who suffer a service connected death while serving on state active duty (including a provision that a determination as to whether an applicant is eligible for an educational costs exemption is vested exclusively in the military department and a provision concerning appealing a determination by the military department). (4) Purple Heart recipients (and adds individuals who were wounded as a result of enemy action). Repeals provisions that list tuition and fee exemptions and reductions outside of the higher education provisions. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Educational costs exemptions. Amends the eligibility requirements for educational costs exemptions for children of and certain individuals related to certain veterans. Provides that a spouse or dependent of a qualified veteran is eligible to pay the resident tuition rate of a state educational institution if certain requirements are met. Removes the following: (1) Provisions concerning cumulative grade point average requirements for individuals who qualify for an exemption because of a father or mother (or other relation for certain individuals) who enlisted or otherwise initially served in the armed forces of the United States after June 30, 2011. (2) A provision requiring the commission for higher education to consider other higher education financial assistance in determining the amount of an exemption. (Another provision in current law requires any other financial assistance specifically designated for educational costs to be subtracted from the amount an applicant is exempt from paying.) Repeals and relocates, with changes to the eligibility requirements, the following categories of individuals exempted from educational costs at state educational institutions: (1) Children or surviving spouses of public safety officers. (2) Children or spouses of members of the 1977 police officers' and firefighters' pension and disability fund who sustain a catastrophic physical personal injury in the line of duty. (3) Children and spouses of Indiana National Guard members who suffer a service connected death while serving on state active duty (including a provision that a determination as to whether an applicant is eligible for an educational costs exemption is vested exclusively in the military department and a provision concerning appealing a determination by the military department). (4) Purple Heart recipients (and adds individuals who were wounded as a result of enemy action). Repeals provisions that list tuition and fee exemptions and reductions outside of the higher education provisions. Makes conforming changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Harris) failed (Y: 32 N: 63 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House - Amendment #2 (Harris) failed (Y: 32 N: 63 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-20 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Public Law 112 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 519: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2019-04-02 | House | Representative Jackson added as cosponsor |
2019-04-02 | House | Representative Abbott D added as cosponsor |
2019-04-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 391: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2019-04-01 | House | Amendment #2 (Harris) failed; Roll Call 380: yeas 32, nays 63 |
2019-04-01 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Representative Lauer added as cosponsor |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senator Spartz added as coauthor |
2019-02-07 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Sullivan |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 89: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senator Crane added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as second author |
2019-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |