IN SB0180 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Public Law 100
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Public Law 100
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allocation of wastewater utility costs. Allows a utility company that: (1) provides both water and wastewater service; and (2) has acquired wastewater utility property; to request, in the context of a petition by the utility company to the Indiana utility regulatory commission (IURC) for preapproval of a plan for proposed service enhancement improvements to the utility company's wastewater utility property, authorization from the IURC to allocate a portion of the eligible costs of the utility company's wastewater utility property to the utility company's water customers. Provides that if the petition includes such a request for an allocation of costs, the utility company shall provide a copy of: (1) the petition; and (2) the utility company's case in chief; to each intervenor in the utility company's last general rate case. Provides that the IURC may approve the request if the IURC finds that: (1) because of reasonable and necessary improvements that are proposed for the wastewater utility property, the resulting rates charged to wastewater customers would reach levels necessitating the provision of financial assistance to those customers; (2) the total rates charged by the utility company for water service will not increase unreasonably as a result of the allocation; (3) the utility company has included information in its proposal regarding the availability of grants or low interest loans and whether the utility company considered using grants or low interest loans to help finance or reduce the cost of the service enhancement improvements; and (4) the utility company has developed an asset management program. Provides that an increase in the total rates charged for water service by the utility company as a result of the allocation is not unreasonable to the extent the allocation results in an increase in authorized total revenues of 2% or less. Provides that if the IURC approves a utility company's request for an allocation of costs, the utility company shall include a notice on or with water customer monthly bills specifying the amount of the service enhancement improvement adjustment rider approved by the commission that recovers necessary wastewater utility improvements.
Title
Allocation of wastewater utility costs.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] | Rep. David Hall [R] |
Rep. Robert Heaton [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Public Law 100 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 390: yeas 46, nays 1 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2023-04-04 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2023-04-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 336: yeas 85, nays 5 |
2023-03-30 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-03-30 | House | Amendment #3 (Culp) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-03-21 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Representatives Hall D and Heaton added as cosponsors |
2023-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-02-21 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Soliday |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 137: yeas 44, nays 2 |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Koch |