IN SB0176 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires: (1) newly qualified nonparticipating tobacco product manufacturers; and (2) nonparticipating tobacco product manufacturers that the attorney general determines pose an elevated risk of noncompliance with tobacco product regulations; to post a surety bond. Requires a person that imports cigarette brand families of a nonparticipating manufacturer to assume joint and several liability with the nonparticipating manufacturer for qualified escrow payments and associated penalties, costs, and fees.
Title
Nonparticipating tobacco product manufacturers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 24 | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-02-25 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-02-22 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-02-16 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | |
2010-02-16 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 174: Yeas 93, Nays 0 | |
2010-02-15 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-11 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-02 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy | |
2010-01-28 | Cosponsors: Reps. Crawford, Koch and Pryor | |
2010-01-28 | House sponsor: Rep. Pearson | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to the House | |
2010-01-28 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 60: Yeas 46 and Nays 0 | |
2010-01-26 | Senator Lawson added as second author | |
2010-01-26 | Senator Deig added as coauthor | |
2010-01-25 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-21 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-11 | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Public Policy & Interstate Cooperation | |
2010-01-11 | Authored by Senator Miller |