IN SB0037 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
Pending: House Courts and Criminal Code Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Possession of paraphernalia. Excludes possession of rolling papers and raw materials from the crime of possession of paraphernalia, and removes possession of paraphernalia as an infraction. Makes the knowing or intentional possession of paraphernalia a Class C misdemeanor, and increases the penalty to a Class A misdemeanor if the person has a prior unrelated judgment or conviction. Makes it a Level 6 felony to possess a hypodermic needle with intent to commit a controlled substance offense. (Under current law, the offense only applies if committed with intent to violate the legend drug act). Specifies that the sentencing enhancement that applies
Title
Possession of paraphernalia. Excludes possession of rolling papers and raw materials from the crime of possession of paraphernalia, and removes possession of paraphernalia as an infraction. Makes the knowing or intentional possession of paraphernalia a Class C misdemeanor, and increases the penalty to a Class A misdemeanor if the person has a prior unrelated judgment or conviction. Makes it a Level 6 felony to possess a hypodermic needle with intent to commit a controlled substance offense. (Under current law, the offense only applies if committed with intent to violate the legend drug act). Specifies that the sentencing enhancement that applies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Representative McNamara added as sponsor |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 17: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as second author |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-06 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bray |