IN SB0035 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 168
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-4)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 168
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Financial literacy. Provides that, beginning with the cohort of students who are expected to graduate from a public school, a charter school, or a state accredited nonpublic school in 2028, an individual must successfully complete a personal financial responsibility course (course) before the individual may graduate. Creates requirements for content that must be covered in a course. Provides that a public school, a charter school, or a state accredited nonpublic school must offer instruction on a course as a separate subject. Provides that the state board may allow a course to satisfy one or more diploma course requirements.
Title
Financial literacy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Moseley) failed (Y: 31 N: 64 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-04 - House - House - Amendment #4 (McGuire) prevailed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Moseley) failed (Y: 31 N: 64 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-04-04 - House - House - Amendment #4 (McGuire) prevailed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Public Law 168 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 475: yeas 45, nays 0 |
2023-04-25 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 495: yeas 85, nays 0 |
2023-04-24 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2023-04-24 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as conferee |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. removed as conferee |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senator Raatz removed as advisor |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senator Deery added as advisor |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Yoder, Raatz and Rogers |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Gaskill and Ford J.D. |
2023-04-14 | House | House advisors appointed: Davis, Hall, Behning and Pfaff |
2023-04-14 | House | House conferees appointed: King and Smith V |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2023-04-06 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 366: yeas 88, nays 1 |
2023-04-04 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-04-04 | House | Amendment #1 (Moseley) failed; Roll Call 347: yeas 31, nays 64 |
2023-04-04 | House | Amendment #4 (McGuire) prevailed; Roll Call 346: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2023-03-30 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2023-02-27 | House | Representative Rowray E added as cosponsor |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senator Glick added as coauthor |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Davis M and Hall D |
2023-01-31 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative King |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 41: yeas 47, nays 2 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as coauthor |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Senator Qaddoura added as coauthor |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Gaskill) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as coauthor |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Senators Johnson, Crane, Ford J.D. added as coauthors |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Senators Deery, Alexander, Byrne, Freeman, Koch, Donato, Sandlin, Holdman added as coauthors |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as third author |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as second author |
2023-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Gaskill |