IN HJR0003 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that only marriage between one man and one woman shall be valid or recognized as a marriage in Indiana. This proposed amendment has not been agreed to by the previous general assembly.
Title
Marriage.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Turner [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Rep. Timothy Wesco [R] | Rep. Wes Culver [R] |
Rep. Rhonda Rhoads [R] | Rep. Robert Heaton [R] | Rep. Donald Lehe [R] | Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] |
Rep. Randall Frye [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Floor - (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House - HJR 3 Amendment #3 (Truitt), prevailed (Y: 52 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Elections and Apportionment - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Floor - (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House - HJR 3 Amendment #3 (Truitt), prevailed (Y: 52 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - (Y: 67 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Elections and Apportionment - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-13 | House | Public Law 225 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 201: yeas 32 and nays 17 |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Frye added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Senator Kruse added as sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Lehman added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Lehe added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Heaton added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-28 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 70: yeas 57 and nays 40 |
2014-01-27 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-27 | House | HJR 3 Amendment #3 (Truitt), prevailed; Roll Call 59: yeas 52 and nays 43 |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted; Roll Call 37, yeas 67, nays 30. |
2014-01-21 | House | Reassigned to Elections and Apportionment |
2014-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Turner. |
2014-01-09 | House | First Reading: Referred to Judiciary |
2014-01-09 | House | Coauthored by: Representatives Wesco, Culver, Rhoads |