IN HCR0032 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Returned to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Celebrating the 100th year anniversary of Riley Children's Health at Indiana University Health. A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION celebrating the 100th year anniversary of Riley Children's Health at Indiana University Health.
Title
Celebrating the 100th year anniversary of Riley Children's Health at Indiana University Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | Senate | Returned to the House |
2024-02-29 | Senate | First reading: adopted voice vote |
2024-02-27 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2024-02-26 | House | First reading: adopted |
2024-02-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative Moed |
2024-02-26 | House | Authored by Representative Barrett |
2024-02-26 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau and Hunley |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2024/resolutions/house/concurrent/32/details |
Text | https://iga.in.gov/pdf-documents/123/2024/house/resolutions/HC0032/HC0032.01.INTR.pdf |