IN HB1606 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-12 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Rural entrepreneurship area incentives. Permits the office of community and rural affairs (office) to designate an applicant rural county as a rural entrepreneurship area development incentives area (READI area). Provides for the distribution of adjusted gross income taxes paid annually by employees working in an area for a new business or paid annually by additional employees in an existing business and by the new business itself to the rural county for the development of new business opportunities in the rural county, including transfers to local or regional venture capital funds. Limits the amount that may be distributed to a particular
Title
Rural entrepreneurship area incentives. Permits the office of community and rural affairs (office) to designate an applicant rural county as a rural entrepreneurship area development incentives area (READI area). Provides for the distribution of adjusted gross income taxes paid annually by employees working in an area for a new business or paid annually by additional employees in an existing business and by the new business itself to the rural county for the development of new business opportunities in the rural county, including transfers to local or regional venture capital funds. Limits the amount that may be distributed to a particular
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Smaltz [R] | Rep. Greg Beumer [R] | Rep. Matt Pierce [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-05 | House | Representative Pierce added as coauthor |
2015-01-20 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development |
2015-01-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative Beumer |
2015-01-20 | House | Authored by Representative Smaltz |