IN HB1351 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 failed for lack of constitutional majority; Roll Call 467: yeas 24 and nays 24
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 failed for lack of constitutional majority; Roll Call 467: yeas 24 and nays 24
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the division of family resources to establish a statewide program that prohibits Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) assistance from being used for any food, food product, or beverage that is not permitted to be purchased under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program. Requires the office of the secretary of family and social services (office) to administer, not later than January 1, 2016, a drug testing program (program) for individuals who have been convicted of a controlled substance offense and are applying for or receiving TANF assistance or receiving TANF assistance on behalf of a child. Establishes requirements for the program and ineligibility penalties. Prohibits an individual who is ineligible to receive TANF assistance under the program from receiving assistance on behalf of a child and provides for an exception. Requires the office to collect data to assess and avoid discrimination in the program. Requires the office to provide information to the Indiana housing and community development authority and any division of the office that implements the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program concerning an individual who tests positive for controlled substances. Requires the department of workforce development to submit a report to the legislative council and the unemployment insurance oversight committee concerning certain unemployment topics.
Title
Welfare matters; drug testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 24 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 135104 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 135103 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 69 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs - Roll Call 135101 (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations - Roll Call 135104 (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 135103 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 69 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs - Roll Call 135101 (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 failed for lack of constitutional majority; Roll Call 467: yeas 24 and nays 24 |
2014-03-13 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 517: yeas 81 and nays 17 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Steele added as conferee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Steele removed as advisor |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senator Tallian removed as conferee |
2014-03-13 | House | Representative VanNatter added as conferee |
2014-03-13 | House | Representative Riecken removed as conferee |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senator Smith added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senator Hume added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senator Steele added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as conferee |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senator M. Young added as conferee |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Bartlett added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Cox added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Koch added as advisor |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative Riecken added as conferee |
2014-03-05 | House | Representative McMillin added as conferee |
2014-03-05 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 334: yeas 34 and nays 14 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as cosponsor. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1351 Amendment #5 (Taylor), failed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1351 Amendment #1 (Tallian), failed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1351 Amendment #2 (Young, M.), prevailed; Division of the Senate: yeas 32, nays 11. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1351 Amendment #4 (Young, M.), prevailed. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HB 1351 Amendment #3 (Young, M.), prevailed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Smith added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Hershman added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senator Mishler added third sponsor. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Appropriations |
2014-02-10 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Health and Provider Services |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Ubelhor added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Burton added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Braun added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Turner added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Speedy added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative VanNatter added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Morris added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Representative Lucas added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2014-01-28 | House | Senator Yoder added as second sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Senator Young R Michael added as sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 100: yeas 71 and nays 22 |
2014-01-27 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2014-01-27 | House | HB 1351 Amendment #2 (Riecken) motion withdrawn. |
2014-01-27 | House | HB 1351 Amendment #6 (McMillin), failed. |
2014-01-27 | House | HB 1351 Amendment #7 (McMillin), prevailed. |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-21 | House | Representative Mahan added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | House | Representative DeVon added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | House | Representative Rhoads added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | House | Representative Smaltz added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | House | Representative Huston added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | House | Representative Ober added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | House | Representative Frye added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | House | Representative Harman added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | House | Representative Neese added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | House | Representative Culver added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | House | Representative Messmer added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | House | Representative Kubacki added as coauthor. |
2014-01-21 | House | Representative Koch added as coauthor. |
2014-01-15 | House | First Reading: Referred to Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2014-01-15 | House | Authored by Representative McMillin. |