IN HB1316 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 224
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 224
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
IFA approval and revolving loan programs. Provides that a participant may issue and sell bonds to the Indiana finance authority (authority) without the requirement of an increase to the user rates and charges of the participant. Provides that the bonds must be issued under a resolution or ordinance and the proceeds must be used to carry out the purposes allowed by the program. Defines the term "independent evaluator" for purposes of non-revenue water audits. Requires a water utility to annually perform an audit of its water distribution system through the use of the latest version of the American Water Works Association's free water audit software or other methodology software to determine the causes of the water utility's non-revenue water. Provides that the issuance, by the ports of Indiana, of both taxable and tax exempt revenue bonds of the state, payable solely from revenues for the purpose of paying all or any part of the cost of a port or project, is subject to the prior approval of the authority. Provides for the appointment of a nine member board of directors of the Indiana Secondary Market for Education Loans, Inc. (ISMEL). Provides that ISMEL may only borrow money after consulting with the authority not less than three months before ISMEL begins the process of borrowing money. Requires ISMEL to, at least 30 days prior to the issuance or placement of any bond, note, or other instrument, report to the budget committee the estimated amount of the bonds.
Title
IFA approval and revolving loan programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Public Law 224 |
2023-05-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 508: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2023-04-27 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 525: yeas 88, nays 0 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2023-04-26 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Melton and Koch |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Charbonneau and Qaddoura |
2023-04-25 | House | House advisors appointed: O'Brien and Pfaff |
2023-04-25 | House | House conferees appointed: Miller D and Harris |
2023-04-25 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2023-04-25 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 436: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Baldwin) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second sponsor |
2023-02-27 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-02-14 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau |
2023-02-14 | House | Title Amended |
2023-02-14 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 127: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2023-02-13 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-02-09 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-01-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-01-12 | House | Authored by Representative Miller D |