IN HB1212 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 221
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Public Law 221
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Privacy protections for nonprofit organizations. Defines "personal information" as data that directly or indirectly identifies a "person" (including an individual, a corporation, a limited liability company, a government entity, a partnership, a trust, an estate, or other entity) as a: (1) member or supporter of; (2) volunteer for; or (3) donor to; a nonprofit organization. With certain exceptions, prohibits a state agency (including an executive, judicial, or legislative branch agency, state educational institution, or body corporate and politic) or political subdivision from doing the following: (1) Requiring a person or nonprofit organization to provide personal information to the state agency or political subdivision. (2) Releasing, publicizing, or publicly disclosing personal information in the state agency or political subdivision's possession. (3) Requesting or requiring a current or prospective contractor or grantee to provide a list of nonprofit organizations to which the current or prospective contractor or grantee has provided financial or nonfinancial support. Provides that personal information is considered confidential and is not subject to disclosure under Indiana's access to public records act (APRA). Provides that a person alleging a violation of the bill's provisions may bring a civil action for injunctive relief, specified damages, or both. Provides that: (1) a public employee; (2) a public official; or (3) an employee or officer of a contractor or subcontractor for a public agency; who violates the bill's provisions is subject to the penalties and discipline that apply with respect to violations of APRA.
Title
Privacy protections for nonprofit organizations.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Karickhoff [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Rowray [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] |
Sen. James Buck [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 74 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 74 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Public Law 221 |
2023-05-04 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2023-05-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 481: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2023-04-24 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 485: yeas 74, nays 20 |
2023-04-24 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2023-04-24 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Pol and Koch |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Brown L and Taylor G |
2023-04-14 | House | House advisors appointed: Rowray, Torr, Speedy and Garcia Wilburn |
2023-04-14 | House | House conferees appointed: Karickhoff and Hatfield |
2023-04-12 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2023-04-12 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 270: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senator Buck added as third sponsor |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second sponsor |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2023-02-23 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2023-01-31 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Brown L |
2023-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 54: yeas 77, nays 21 |
2023-01-30 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2023-01-26 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2023-01-19 | House | Representative Rowray E added as coauthor |
2023-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Karickhoff |