IN HB1181 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Public Law 143
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Public Law 143
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Horticultural matters. Provides that the state seed commissioner shall use certain federal agricultural seed and vegetable seed standards as the state germination standards and requirements for agricultural seeds and vegetable seeds. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Horticultural matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Public Law 143 |
2024-03-13 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2024-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2024-03-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 288: yeas 89, nays 0 |
2024-03-05 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 255: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as third sponsor |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2024-02-12 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2024-02-02 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2024-02-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 121: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2024-02-01 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Leising and Glick |
2024-01-31 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2024-01-29 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2024-01-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development |
2024-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Aylesworth |