IL SR1519 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
States the opinion of the Illinois Senate that the proposed educational pension cost shift from the State of Illinois to local school districts, community colleges, and institutions of higher education is financially wrong.
Title
EDUCATION PENSION COST SHIFT
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Rezin [R] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. William McCann [R] | Sen. David Luechtefeld [R] |
Sen. William Haine [D] | Sen. Kyle McCarter [R] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-12-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David S. Luechtefeld |
2014-11-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2014-11-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-11-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1519&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SR/09800SR1519.htm |