IL SJR0057 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Arrived in House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Arrived in House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares May 1, 2024 as Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority, Incorporated Day in the State of Illinois.
Title
ALPHA KAPPA ALPHA DAY 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 1, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=57&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SJR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SJR/10300SJ0057.htm |