IL SB3661 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Health Care Worker Background Check Act. Changes the definition of a health care employer to include a Comprehensive Community Mental Health Center certified by the Department of Human Services.
Title
HEALTH CARE-BACKGROUND CHECK
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 006-003-000 |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-004-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Health and Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Health and Human Services |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Health and Human Services |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 46 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 46 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 46 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 46 | 80 | New Code | See Bill Text |