IL SB3637 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health may designate a Veterans Administration hospital for participation in an EMS system. Defines "Veterans Administration hospital" to mean a health care facility operated by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs that has been certified by a nationally recognized certifying body approved by the Illinois Department of Public Health and that has applied for participation in an EMS system. Effective immediately.
Title
VETERANS ADMIN HOSPITAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1009 | |
2010-07-06 | Effective Date January 1, 2011 | |
2010-07-06 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-29 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-28 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 009-000-000 | |
2010-04-08 | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-18 | First Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe | |
2010-03-18 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-18 | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 18, 2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Munoz | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 008-000-000 | |
2010-03-16 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 4, 2010 | |
2010-03-03 | Do Pass Public Health; 009-000-000 | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Public Health | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-11 | First Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |