IL SB3615 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Restorative Justice
Pending: House Restorative Justice Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 9:00 am in Room 115
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Restorative Justice
Pending: House Restorative Justice Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 9:00 am in Room 115
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the Department of Juvenile Justice shall not be required to keep in an interest-bearing bank account deposited moneys of persons who have or receives money while in an institution or facility of the Department of Juvenile Justice unless the annual interest earned would exceed the total annual costs and fees, including, but not limited to, transaction fees, associated with maintaining the account. Provides that any interest or other income which may be earned from moneys deposited with the Department by a resident of the Department of Juvenile Justice (rather than in excess of $200) shall accrue to the individual's account if the monthly interest attributable to an individual's account exceeds $1. Provides that all other balances shall accrue to the Residents' Benefit Fund.
Title
DEPT JUV JUSTICE-RESIDENT-FUND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 010-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 9, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Do Pass Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Postponed - Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-4-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |