IL SB3615 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nursing Home Care Act. Requires the Department of Public Health to establish by rule guidelines for required continuing education of all employees who inspect, survey, or evaluate a facility and to offer continuing education opportunities at least quarterly. Provides that the Department shall notify a facility and complainant of its findings regarding a complainant's complaint within 5 calendar days (rather than 10 days) of the determination. Provides that employees of a State or unit of local government agency charged with inspecting, surveying, or evaluating facilities are required to complete at least 10 hours of continuing education annually. Provides that if a facility is found to have violated any provision of the Act or rule adopted under the Act, the facility shall develop a plan of correction to address deficiencies indicated in a statement of deficiency. Requires the Department to approve or deny the plan of correction within 72 hours after receiving the plan of correction. Provides that the Department shall conduct an annual review of all survey activity from the preceding calendar year (rather than conduct an annual review) and make a report including specified information concerning the complaint and survey process. Contains other provisions.
Title
NURSING HOMES-INSPECTIONS
Sponsors
Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Patrick Joyce [D] | Sen. Adriane Johnson [D] |
Sen. Robert Peters [D] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 18, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 45 | 3-212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 45 | 3-702 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3615&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB3615.htm |