IL SB3538 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 80-10)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Insurance Committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room C-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Insurance Committee
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 3:00 pm in Room C-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code and the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that, if a municipality or county, including a home rule municipality or county, is a self-insurer for purposes of providing health insurance coverage for its employees, the insurance coverage shall include mental health counseling for any employee who is a first responder, including police and corrections officers, deputy sheriffs, firefighters, or emergency medical services personnel, without imposing a deductible, coinsurance, copayment, or any other cost-sharing requirement on the coverage provided. Specifies that this requirement does not apply to the extent such coverage would disqualify a high-deductible health plan from eligibility for a health savings account pursuant to the Internal Revenue Code. Preempts home rule.
Title
LOC FIRST RESPONDER INSURANCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2024-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 007-003-000 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1069 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 10-4-2.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |