IL SB3524 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Sugar-Sweetened Beverages, Syrups, and Powder Tax Law. Imposes a tax on distributors of bottled sugar-sweetened beverages, syrups, or powders. Provides that the tax is imposed at the rate of $0.01 per ounce of bottled sugar-sweetened beverages sold or offered for sale to a retailer for sale in the State to a consumer. Provides that the distributor shall add the amount of the tax to the price of sugar-sweetened beverages sold to a retailer, and the retailer shall pass the amount of the tax through to the consumer. Requires those distributors to obtain permits. Contains provisions concerning the distribution of the proceeds. Effective January 1, 2015.
Title
SWEETENED BEVERAGE TAX
Sponsors
Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] | Sen. Heather Steans [D] |
Sen. Donne Trotter [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Ira Silverstein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |