IL SB3433 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Creates the Department of Human Services Community Reporting Systems Task Force to work on upgrading the Department's Community Reporting Systems, otherwise known as ROCS, as well as any other applicable IT systems associated with ROCS that should need upgrading. Contains provisions on the composition of the Task Force and requires members to be appointed on or before January 1, 2025. Requires the Task Force to prepare a comprehensive report, on or before July 1, 2025, that summarizes its work and details its action plans to upgrade the Community Reporting System and other associated IT infrastructure, including contracting, fiscal impact, legislative appropriations, and any other barriers to upgrading the ROCS System. Provides that the Task Force is dissolved on January 1, 2026. Effective July 1, 2024.
Title
DHS-REPORTING SYST TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2024 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 19, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass Health and Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Health and Human Services |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Health and Human Services |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3433&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB3433.htm |