IL SB3424 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Oil and Gas Wells on Public Lands Act. Provides that on and after January 1, 2015, no new permits shall be issued for surface extraction activities on lands owned by the Department of Natural Resources or the federal government. Prohibits the Department of Natural Resources from entering into contracts in writing designating any person as the permittee of the State of Illinois with the exclusive right to prospect and explore public lands of the State of Illinois for the occurrence of petroleum. Repeals provisions governing certain petroleum leases, right of way over public lands and preferential rights to prospecting permits. Effective immediately.
Title
OIL & GAS-PERMIT MORATORIUM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 11, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EN) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Energy |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 615 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 17 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 18 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 21 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 615 | 9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |