IL SB3380 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
Pending: Senate Appropriations - Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
Pending: Senate Appropriations - Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. In provisions requiring the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to make certain per diem add-on payments to nursing facilities that meet specified staffing levels indicated by the STRIVE study, provides that whenever the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services no longer updates the STRIVE study, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall use the last quarter STRIVE numbers for add-on calculations and shall not decrease the payment amounts until a replacement staff time measurement study is incorporated by law.
Title
DHFS-NURSING-ADD-ON PAYMENTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations - Health and Human Services |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3380&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB3380.htm |