IL SB3342 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Pesticide Application on Rights-of-Way Notification Act. Provides that, at least 24 hours before applying a pesticide to a public right-of-way that is located within the corporate boundaries of a municipality, a certified applicator employed or contracted with by the State or a unit of local government to apply the pesticide shall provide notice of the application to all residents whose residences are located within 200 feet of the public right-of-way to be treated. Provides for monetary penalties for violations following an administrative hearing with the Department of Agriculture. Provides penalties for violations of the Act following an administrative hearing. Specifies that penalties are to be deposited into the Pesticide Control Fund, with unpaid penalties subject to collection by the Attorney General. Creates a petty offense and provides for an alternative prosecution by a State's Attorney following referral by the Department of Agriculture, with identical fines for the petty offense. Provides for the adoption of rules by the Department of Agriculture. Defines terms.
Title
PESTICIDES-APPLICATION NOTICE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-05-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-30 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 019-008-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-04-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 008-000-000 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve McClure |