IL SB3294 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Labor Relations Act. Specifies that, for purposes of a provision in the Act concerning the resolution of disputes involving security employees, that the term "units of security employees of a public employer" includes units of county correction or detention officers, units of probation officers, and units of telecommunicators who are critical to public safety.
Title
SECURITY EMPLOYEE BARGAINING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Labor |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Labor |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 315 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3294&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB3294.htm |