IL SB3282 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Requires each holder of a Direct Pay Permit to review its purchase activity by January 31 and July 31 of each year to verify that the purchases made in the preceding 6-month period were sourced correctly and the correct tax rate was applied. Sets forth penalties for failure to comply with the reporting requirements. Effective immediately.
Title
ROTA-PURCHASE REVIEW
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
2024-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2024-05-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2024-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
2024-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 120 | 2-10.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |