IL SB3076 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1110
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Public Health's required publication of advance directive law must include the practitioner (instead of "physician") orders for life-sustaining treatment (POLST) form. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall develop and publish a uniform form for practitioner cardiopulmonary resuscitation (CPR) or life-sustaining treatment orders (instead of "physician do-not-resuscitate orders") that may be used in all settings. Changes references to the Department of Public Health DNR Advance Directive Form to references to the Department of Public Health Uniform POLST form. Makes corresponding changes in the Nursing Home Care Act, the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act, the Hospital Licensing Act, and the Health Care Surrogate Act. Further amends the Health Care Surrogate Act. Provides that any attending health care practitioner (instead of "physician") may execute a POLST form or advance directive form. Defines "attending health practitioner" as an individual who (1) is an Illinois licensed physician, advanced practice nurse, physician assistant, or licensed resident after completion of one year in a program; (2) is selected by or assigned to the patient; and (3) has primary responsibility for treatment and care of the patient. Provides that nothing in the Section concerning POLST forms or do-not-resuscitate advance directive forms shall be construed to affect the ability of an individual to include instructions in an advance directive, such as a power of attorney for health care. Deletes language concerning the form of a DNR Advance Directive.
Title
ADVANCE DIRECTIVES-POLST FORM
Sponsors
Sen. John Mulroe [D] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] |
Rep. Naomi Jakobsson [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 50 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 50 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 18 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1110 |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date August 26, 2014 |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 040-016-001 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Public Health; 006-000-000 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Public Health |
2014-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 22, 2014 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2014-05-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 061-050-001 |
2014-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2014-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2014-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-14 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 007-001-001 |
2014-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-05-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2014-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-03 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2014-04-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 034-018-001 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 27, 2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 007-002-000 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2310 | 2310-600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 45 | 2-104.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 50 | 3.57 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 85 | 6.19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
755 | 40 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |