IL SB2992 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1146
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1146
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Juvenile Justice Mortality Review Team Act. Provides that a mortality review team shall review a youth death as soon as practicable and not later than within 60 (rather than 90) days after a law enforcement agency's completion of its investigation if the death is the result of alleged or suspected criminal activity. Provides that if there has been no investigation by a law enforcement agency, the mortality review team shall review a youth's death within 60 (rather than 90) days after obtaining the information necessary to complete the review from the coroner, pathologist, medical examiner, or law enforcement agency, depending on the nature of the case. Provides that within 60 (rather than 90) days after the Director of Juvenile Justice submits a reply with respect to a recommendation concerning the prevention of deaths of youth in the Department of Juvenile Justice's custody, the Director must submit an additional report to the chairperson of the team that sets forth in detail the way, if any, in which the Director will implement the recommendation and the schedule for implementing the recommendation. Provides that within 120 (rather than 180) days after the Director submits a reply concerning the implementation of a team's recommendation, the Director shall submit a further report to the chairperson of the team that made the recommendation and to the Executive Inspector General.
Title
DJJ MORTALITY REVIEW
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Dale Righter [R] | Rep. Barbara Currie [D] | Rep. John Cabello [R] |
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-04 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-04 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1146 |
2014-12-30 | Senate | Effective Date December 30, 2014 |
2014-12-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-12-04 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 052-000-000 |
2014-12-04 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-000-000 |
2014-12-04 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-12-03 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000 |
2014-12-03 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000 |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2014-12-03 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2014-12-03 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - December 3, 2014 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2014-12-02 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2014-12-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2014-12-02 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-12-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-12-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2014-12-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-12-02 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-12-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000 |
2014-12-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-12-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-12-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2014-12-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2014-12-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-12-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-12-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-12-01 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2014-05-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2014-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2014-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Restorative Justice Committee; 007-000-000 |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-01 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-01 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-04-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 27, 2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 195 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 195 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 195 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |