IL SB2989 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Barriers Act. Defines "ICC/ANSI A117.1", as used in the Act, as meaning either of the 2 most recent editions of the International Code Council/American National Institute Standard A117.1 ("Accessible and Usable Buildings and Facilities"). Provides that no public facility may be constructed or altered and no multi-story housing may be constructed or altered (rather than only constructed) without the statement of an architect registered in the State of Illinois that the plans for the work to be performed comply with the provisions of the Act and the Code promulgated under the Act unless the cost of such construction or alteration is less than $50,000. Provides that multi-story housing that is not a public facility but that is subject to specified requirements shall be deemed to be in compliance with the Code if all dwelling units in the multi-story housing are required to be adaptable dwelling units comply with the requirements for Type A units in ICC/ANSI A117.1, if dwelling units in the multi-story housing comply with the requirements for Type B units in ICC/ANSI A117.1, and if all common use and public uses spaces comply with the Code. Provides that an election to use this alternative compliance method must be explicitly identified in the required statement made by a professional engineer or a structural engineer.
Title
MULTI-STORY HOUSING-ACCESSIBLE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 25 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 25 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2989&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2989.htm |