IL SB2973 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wireless Emergency Telephone Safety Act. Eliminates the July 1, 2014 repeal of the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
WIRELESS SURCHARGE-RETAIN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-03-06 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Wireless Emergency Telephone Safety |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Re-assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Labor and Commerce |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 751 | 70 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2973&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2973.htm |