IL SB2936 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
Pending: House Revenue & Finance Committee
Hearing: May 9 @ 8:00 am in 114 and Virtual Room 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024
Pending: House Revenue & Finance Committee
Hearing: May 9 @ 8:00 am in 114 and Virtual Room 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the abatement for property located in an area of urban decay also applies to newly remodeled single-family or duplex residential dwelling units (currently, only newly constructed single-family or duplex dwelling units). Provides that provisions requiring the abatement to be reduced in 20% increments annually during the last 4 years of the abatement period apply only to abatements granted prior to the effective date. Effective immediately.
Title
PROPERTY TX-ABATEMENT
Sponsors
Sen. David Koehler [D] | Sen. Win Stoller [R] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] |
Rep. Travis Weaver [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024 |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2024-04-15 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2024-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 18-180 | Amended Code | Citation Text |