IL SB2918 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Assigned to Police & Fire Committee
Pending: House Police & Fire Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 9:00 am in Room 122B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Assigned to Police & Fire Committee
Pending: House Police & Fire Committee
Hearing: May 2 @ 9:00 am in Room 122B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a physical or mental disability that constitutes, in whole or in part, the basis of an application for benefits under the Downstate Police Article of the Illinois Pension Code may not be used, in whole or in part, as a cause for a municipality to discharge a police officer. Provides that, upon a chief of the police department's receipt of a certification from the board of trustees under the Downstate Police Article of the Illinois Pension Code that a police officer is no longer disabled and is able to resume the duties of his or her position, the police officer shall report to the chief of the police department. Provides that the chief of the police department shall thereupon order immediate reinstatement into active service, and the municipality shall immediately return the police officer to its payroll, in the same rank or grade held at the date he or she retired for disability under the Downstate Police Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that the police officer shall then report to the chief of the police department. Provides that the chief of the police department shall thereupon order immediate reinstatement into active service, and the municipality shall immediately return the police officer to its payroll, in the same rank or grade held at the date he or she retired for disability under the Downstate Police Article of the Illinois Pension Code.
Title
MUNI CD-POLICE DISABILITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Assigned to Police & Fire Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2024-04-10 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 9, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Labor; 016-000-000 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Labor; 015-000-000 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 10-1-18.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 10-1-47 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 10-2.1-17.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 10-2.1-24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |