IL SB2671 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a group or individual policy of accident and health insurance or managed care plan that is amended, delivered, issued, or renewed after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall provide coverage for hippotherapy and other forms of therapeutic riding. Makes conforming changes in the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the School Code, and the Health Maintenance Organization Act.
Title
INS CODE-RIDING THERAPY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Insurance |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.3f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 125 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 356z.71 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 375 | 6.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1069.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 10-4-2.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |