IL SB2640 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0756
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0756
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the strategic business development plan prepared by the Illinois Business Development Council shall include: (i) an assessment of the economic development practices of states that border Illinois and (ii) recommendations for best practices with respect to economic development, business incentives, business attraction, and business retention for counties in Illinois that border at least one other state. Effective immediately.
Title
DCEO-BORDER STATES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0756 |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Effective Date July 16, 2014 |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 |
2014-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2014 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2014-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2014-05-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2014-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-05-16 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2014-03-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2014-03-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2014-03-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2014-03-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-001 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 26, 2014 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2014 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 010-000-000 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. William R. Haine |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 605 | 46.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 605 | 605-300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |