IL SB1532 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Illinois Health Facilities Planning Act. Effective immediately.
Title
HEALTH FAC PLANNING ACT-REPEAL
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Cronin [R] | Sen. Kirk Dillard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-26 | Held in Executive; Subcommittee on State and Local Governments | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 3, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Held in Executive; Subcommittee on State and Local Governments | |
2009-03-06 | To Executive Subcommittee on State And Local Government | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-02-19 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-18 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Cronin |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1532&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB1532.htm |