IL HR0807 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares February 21, 2024 as John Lewis Day in the State of Illinois to honor the life and legacy of American hero and civil rights leader John Robert Lewis.
Title
JOHN LEWIS DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-25 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2024-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2024-05-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2024-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2024-05-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2024-05-24 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2024-05-24 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 State Government Administration Committee; Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2024-05-24 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2024-05-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-05-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2024-05-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=807&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0807.htm |