IL HR0121 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Resolution Adopted by Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Resolution Adopted by Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulates the Peoria Notre Dame High School boys soccer team, the Fighting Irish, on winning the 2022 Illinois High School Association Class 2A Boys Soccer Championship. Wishes the team continued success.
Title
CONGRATS-PND HS BOYS SOCCER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Resolution Adopted by Voice Vote |
2023-03-15 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Agreed Resolutions |
2023-03-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=121&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0121.htm |