IL HB5889 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1085
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1085
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Permits a county board in a county with a population of more than 500,000 and less than 700,000, based on the most recent federal decennial census, to enact by ordinance a judicial facilities fee to be used for the building of new judicial facilities. Sets the maximum fee at $30 and provides the method by which the fees are to be paid.
Title
CTY CD-JUDICIAL FACILITIES FEE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 42 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1085 |
2014-08-26 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2015 |
2014-08-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-007-000 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2014 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2014-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2014-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2014 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 26, 2014 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-001-001 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-042-001 |
2014-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-15 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 005-000-000 |
2014-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Counties & Townships Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-05-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2014-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2014-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2014-05-07 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2014-05-07 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2014 |
2014-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr. |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr. |