IL HB5697 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1000
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1000
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that a dependent of a military service member, who is a legal resident of the State, having previously been determined to be eligible for developmental disability services provided by the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, including waiver services provided under the home and community based services programs authorized under Section 1915(c) of the Social Security Act, shall retain eligibility for those developmental disability services as long as he or she remains a legal resident of the State, regardless of having left the State due to the military service member's military assignment outside the State. Provides that if the State eligibility requirements change, the dependent shall retain eligibility until new information is provided by the dependent or military service member to the Department. Contains provisions concerning assessment determinations; eligibility determinations for dependent's who return to the State following a period of absence and who request services including waiver services provided under the home and community based services programs authorized under Section 1915(c) of the Social Security Act; federal waiver application; and rulemaking authority. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAID-MILITARY DEPENDENTS
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Pritchard [R] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. John Cabello [R] | Rep. JoAnn Osmond [R] |
Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Steven Landek [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1000 |
2014-08-18 | House | Effective Date August 18, 2014 |
2014-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2014-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2014 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2014 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2014-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2014-03-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2014-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2014-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2014-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2014-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2014-02-24 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |