IL HB5681 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0999
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0999
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Western Illinois University Law. Requires one of the Board of Trustees' quarterly meetings to be held on the Quad Cities campus of Western Illinois University. Effective immediately.
Title
WIU-BOARD OF TRUSTEES MEETING
Sponsors
Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Patrick Verschoore [D] | Rep. Donald Moffitt [R] | Sen. John Sullivan [D] |
Sen. Mike Jacobs [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0999 |
2014-08-18 | House | Effective Date August 18, 2014 |
2014-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2014 |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 008-000-000 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 25, 2014 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2014-03-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-002-000 |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 013-000-000 |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2014-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine Hammond |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 690 | 35-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |