IL HB5601 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to State Government
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 2:30 pm in Room 409
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to State Government
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 2:30 pm in Room 409
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts concerning various State programs, State funds, and State fund transfers. Deletes obsolete language and makes technical changes. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE AGENCY FND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2024-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-13 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 012-000-000 |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William "Will" Davis |