IL HB5601 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nursing Home Care Act, the MC/DD Act, and the ID/DD Community Care Act. Changes provisions concerning complaints. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall require, instead of request, specified identifying information from complainants. Provides that such identifying information will be kept confidential and complainants shall be made aware that the information is confidential. Provides that the complainant shall be informed of possible sanctions for knowingly or willfully transmitting a false report to the Department. Requires the Department to impose a civil penalty of $250 on complainants if it has a good faith belief that a complaint is frivolous, intended to harass, or intended to defraud the Department. Requires the Department to maintain an internal list of such complainants. Provides that complaints may be classified as "false reports". Provides that false reports shall also be considered disorderly conduct under the Criminal Code of 2012. Effective immediately.
Title
RESIDENTIAL FACILITY COMPLAINT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 008-004-000 |
2016-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-04-05 | House | Remains in Human Services Committee |
2016-04-05 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Human Services Committee; 006-002-000 |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2016-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael D. Unes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 45 | 3-702 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 46 | 3-702 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 47 | 3-702 | Amended Code | Citation Text |