IL HB5506 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Senior Home Preservation Program Act. Requires the Department of Human Services to implement and administer the Senior Home Preservation Program to provide grants to agencies to provide minor rehabilitation services to legacy resident low-income senior homeowners to preserve the habitability and safety of their homes. Provides that grants may be used for housing owned by eligible seniors to reduce the cost of repair and rehabilitation, to remove or correct health or safety hazards, to comply with applicable housing standards or codes, or to make needed repairs to improve the general living conditions of the seniors including improved accessibility for seniors with disabilities. Provides that "legacy resident senior homeowner" means any person 62 years of age or older or 55 and older with a disability who has lived in a community family home (single-family home or owner-occupied building of up to 4 units) for at least 10 years. Defines other terms. Creates the Senior Home Preservation Program Fund as a special fund in the State treasury for the purpose of provide grants to agencies to provide minor rehabilitation services to eligible senior homeowners to preserve the habitability and safety of their homes. Amends the State Finance Act to include the fund as a special fund.
Title
SENIOR HOME PRESERVATION PROG
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2024-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal |