IL HB5224 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Adoption Act. Defines "adult" when referring to a person who is the subject of a petition for adoption under Section 3 of this Act to mean a person who is 18 years old or older. After either the entry of an order terminating parental rights or the entry of a judgment of adoption, the parents of a child or adult sought to be adopted shall be relieved of all parental responsibility for the child or adult and shall be deprived of all legal rights as respects the child or adult, and the child or adult shall be free from all obligations of maintenance and obedience as respects such natural parents. A parent who is also a petitioner in the adoption will retain all parental rights, responsibilities, and obligations.
Title
IMDMA-ADOPTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 013-000-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
750 | 50 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 50 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |