IL HB5155 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nurse Practice Act. Removes a measurement of program effectiveness based on a passage rate of all graduates over the 3 most recent calendar years without reference to first-time test takers. Sets forth provisions concerning how to measure a registered professional nurse education program's effectiveness based on the pass rates on a State-approved licensure examination. Provides that outliers may be removed when calculating State-approved licensure examination pass rates. Provides that a registered professional nurse education program is responsible for tracking outliers. Defines "outlier". Provides that a registered professional nurse education program is responsible for calculating the passage rate of the program's graduates. Provides that the registered professional nurse education program must submit a calculation of the passage rate of the program's graduates and supporting documentation to the Board of Nursing in an annual report due October 30 of every year. Provides that a registered professional nurse education program meeting one of the measurements of program effectiveness shall be deemed to be in good standing. Makes conforming changes.
Title
NURSING PROGRAM EFFECTIVENESS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 65 | 60-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 60-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 65 | 60-7 | New Code | See Bill Text |