IL HB5128 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities
Pending: Senate Energy and Public Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities
Pending: Senate Energy and Public Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Emergency Telephone System Act. Provides that elected officials, including county sheriffs and members of a county board (rather than including members of a county board), are also eligible to serve on an Emergency Telephone System Board.
Title
EM TELEPHONE-BOARD MEMBERS
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] | Rep. Mike Coffey [R] | Rep. John Cabello [R] | Rep. Dave Severin [R] |
Rep. Paul Jacobs [R] | Rep. Jason Bunting [R] | Sen. Dale Fowler [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2024-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Police & Fire Committee; 014-000-000 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Police & Fire Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Police & Fire Committee |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Police & Fire Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 750 | 15.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |