IL HB4921 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 1:30 pm in Room 409
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 1:30 pm in Room 409
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Home Equity Assurance Act. In provisions authoring a governing commission with no less than $4,000,000 in its guarantee fund to establish a Low Interest Home Improvement Loan Program, provides that the loan may be used for repair or maintenance of a guaranteed residence's water and sewer pipes and repair of a guaranteed residence, including, but not limited to, basement repairs, following flooding damage or other natural disaster damage to the property (rather than following flooding damage to the property). Provides that a commission may use loan funds to issue a grant or rebate for repairs, maintenance, remodeling, alteration, or improvement of a guaranteed residence for purposes of preventing or repairing damage as a result of a natural disaster, including, but not limited to, flooding.
Title
HOME EQUITY ASSURANCE-LOANS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 73 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 073-038-000 |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Housing; 012-005-000 |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Housing |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 95 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |